EP3726984 - APPARATUS AND METHODS RELATING TO FREEZING AT LEAST PART OF A BIOLOGICAL SAMPLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biosafe SA Allée de Moulins 3 1274 Grens / CH | [2024/43] |
Former [2020/44] | For all designated states Asymptote Ltd Sovereign House Vision Park, Chivers Way Histon Cambridge CB24 9BZ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORRIS, George Sovereign House, Vision Park Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB24 9ZR / GB | 02 /
LAMB, Stephen Sovereign House, Vision Park Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB24 9ZR / GB | 03 /
KILBRIDE, Peter Sovereign House, Vision Park Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB24 9ZR / GB | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Bedford, Grant Richard Global Life Sciences Solutions Operations UK Ltd Amersham Place Little Chalfont, Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB | [2020/44] | Application number, filing date | 18829839.2 | 20.12.2018 | [2020/44] | WO2018EP86163 | Priority number, date | GB20170021824 | 22.12.2017 Original published format: GB 201721824 | [2020/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2019122106 | Date: | 27.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3726984 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A01N1/02 | [2020/44] | CPC: |
A01N1/0284 (EP,US);
A01N1/0257 (EP,US);
A01N1/0263 (US);
A01N1/0268 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT DEM EINFRIEREN VON MINDESTENS EINEM TEIL EINER BIOLOGISCHEN PROBE | [2020/44] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHODS RELATING TO FREEZING AT LEAST PART OF A BIOLOGICAL SAMPLE | [2020/44] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉS SE RAPPORTANT À LA CONGÉLATION D'AU MOINS UNE PARTIE D'UN ÉCHANTILLON BIOLOGIQUE | [2020/44] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 25.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M04) [2024/39] | 27.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]CN2049746U (YE CHANGZHU [CN]); | [XI]US2013091890 (SCHRYVER BRIAN [US], et al); | [X]US2014165645 (SCHRYVER BRIAN [US]); | [XI]WO2016178635 (NAT UNIV HOSPITAL (SINGAPORE) PTE LTD [SG], et al); |