27.02.2024 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.02.2024 |
Change - representative |
|
26.01.2024 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.12.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.02.2023 |
Change - representative |
|
19.12.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.08.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
13.07.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.07.2022 |
First examination report |
|
27.12.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.08.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
26.02.2021 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
26.02.2021 |
Change - extension states |
published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
05.02.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
22.01.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
25.12.2020 |
Change - applicant |
published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] |
21.12.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.09.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.10.2020 [2020/44] |
25.09.2020 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
25.09.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.10.2020 [2020/44] |
31.08.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.06.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.05.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.05.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.05.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
18.05.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.06.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.06.2019 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
19.03.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.01.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|