Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11365690 | Global Dossier | 21.06.2022 | B2 | US2021025336 | 28.01.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17208567 | 19.12.2017 | WO2018EP84598 | 12.12.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111527293B | Global Dossier | 21.04.2023 | B | CN111527293 | 11.08.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | EP17208567 | 19.12.2017 | WO2018EP84598 | 12.12.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3083332 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2022 | C | CA3083332 | 27.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17208567 | 19.12.2017 | WO2018EP84598 | 12.12.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3728816 | Global Dossier | 28.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17208567 | 19.12.2017 | WO2018EP84598 | 12.12.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2744116 | 02.03.2021 | C1 | Priority number | Date | EP17208567 | 19.12.2017 | WO2018EP84598 | 12.12.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019121252 | Global Dossier | 27.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17208567 | 19.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3502438 | Global Dossier | 26.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17208567 | 19.12.2017 |