Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3728977 | Global Dossier | 04.08.2021 | B1 | EP3728977 | 28.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1762417 | 19.12.2017 | WO2018FR53333 | 17.12.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019122655 | Global Dossier | 27.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1762417 | 19.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR3075339 | 22.11.2019 | B1 | FR3075339 | 21.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1762417 | 19.12.2017 |