EP3657335 - METHOD, DEVICE, AND APPARATUS FOR TRACKING AND MONITORING SOFTWARE BEHAVIOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2020/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Binwu ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2020/22] | Representative(s) | Aipex B.V. Vestdijk 51 5611 CA Eindhoven / NL | [2024/23] |
Former [2020/22] | Aipex B.V. P.O. Box 30223 3001 DE Rotterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 18835817.0 | 20.07.2018 | [2020/22] | WO2018CN96443 | Priority number, date | CN201710598659 | 21.07.2017 Original published format: CN201710598659 | [2020/22] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019015670 | Date: | 24.01.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3657335 | Date: | 27.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3657335 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/30, G06F11/34 | [2020/22] | CPC: |
G06F11/302 (EP,CN);
G06F11/3051 (CN);
G06F11/3423 (EP);
G06F11/3438 (EP,CN);
G06F11/3452 (EP);
G06F11/3466 (EP,CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND GERÄT ZUR VERFOLGUNG UND ÜBERWACHUNG VON SOFTWAREVERHALTEN | [2020/22] | English: | METHOD, DEVICE, AND APPARATUS FOR TRACKING AND MONITORING SOFTWARE BEHAVIOR | [2020/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET APPAREIL DE SUIVI ET DE SURVEILLANCE DE COMPORTEMENT DE LOGICIEL | [2020/22] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2019 | Translation filed | 20.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 20.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/22] | 29.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US5838920 (ROSBOROUGH JAMES M [US]); | [A]EP1308844 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) | International search | [X]CN1688979 (IBM [US]); | [A]US2012289191 (PUURA SAMI MIKAEL [FI]); | [A]CN103118248 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); | [A]CN106611397 (ALIBABA GROUP HOLDING LTD); | [A]CN106708818 (ALIBABA GROUP HOLDING LTD) | Examination | WO2011065692 | US2013198363 |