EP3737620 - SEALED SINGLE-DOSE BREAK-OPEN PACKAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/47] | SEALED SINGLE-DOSE BREAK-OPEN PACKAGE AND RELATIVE PRODUCTION METHOD | ||
[2021/38] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states V-Shapes S.r.l. Via Persicetana 20/B 40012 Calderara di Reno (BO) / IT | [2020/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gustvasson, Erland Jesper Loc. Poggio Ciliegio, 1 52100 AREZZO (AR) / IT | [2021/32] |
Former [2020/50] | 01 /
Gustvasson, Erland Jesper Transtigen 13 54534 Töreboda / SE | ||
Former [2020/47] | 01 /
Gustvasson, Erland Jesper St. Dr. Kristinas vag. 1 Sigtuna / SE | Representative(s) | Zanotti, Laura Via Galilei, 6 47838 Riccione (RN) / IT | [2020/47] | Application number, filing date | 18840079.0 | 18.12.2018 | [2020/47] | WO2018IT00166 | Priority number, date | IT20170149752 | 09.01.2018 Original published format: IT201700149752 | IT20170149766 | 09.01.2018 Original published format: IT201700149766 | [2020/47] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019138435 | Date: | 18.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3737620 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3737620 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B65D75/58 | [2020/47] | CPC: |
B65D75/585 (EP,US);
B65D75/5855 (US);
B65D2221/00 (US);
B65D75/30 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/47] | Extension states | BA | 30.07.2020 | ME | 30.07.2020 | Validation states | KH | 30.07.2020 | MA | 30.07.2020 | MD | 30.07.2020 | TN | 30.07.2020 | Title | German: | VERSIEGELTE EINZELDOSIS-AUFBRECHPACKUNG | [2021/38] | English: | SEALED SINGLE-DOSE BREAK-OPEN PACKAGE | [2021/38] | French: | EMBALLAGE À OUVERTURE PAR RUPTURE POUR DOSE UNIQUE | [2021/38] |
Former [2020/47] | VERSIEGELTE EINZELDOSIS-AUFREISSVERPACKUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [2020/47] | SEALED SINGLE-DOSE BREAK-OPEN PACKAGE AND RELATIVE PRODUCTION METHOD | ||
Former [2020/47] | EMBALLAGE À OUVERTURE PAR RUPTURE, POUR DOSE UNIQUE, SCELLÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION ASSOCIÉ | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/47] | 07.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 01.02.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.12.2018 | AL | 09.03.2022 | AT | 09.03.2022 | CY | 09.03.2022 | FI | 09.03.2022 | HR | 09.03.2022 | LV | 09.03.2022 | MC | 09.03.2022 | MK | 09.03.2022 | MT | 09.03.2022 | RS | 09.03.2022 | SK | 09.03.2022 | SM | 09.03.2022 | BG | 09.06.2022 | NO | 09.06.2022 | GR | 10.06.2022 | IS | 09.07.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 18.12.2018 | |
AL | 09.03.2022 | ||
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CY | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
MC | 09.03.2022 | ||
MK | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 18.12.2018 | |
AL | 09.03.2022 | ||
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CY | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
MK | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/24] | HU | 18.12.2018 | |
AL | 09.03.2022 | ||
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CY | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CY | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 09.03.2022 | |
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 09.03.2022 | |
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 09.03.2022 | |
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | FI | 09.03.2022 | |
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 09.03.2022 | |
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 09.03.2022 | |
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | NO | 09.06.2022 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO0144071 (MOODIE MALCOLM MELSETTER [ZA]) [Y] 1-13 * abstract * * page 9, line 5 - page 11, line 16 *; | [IDY]WO2008038074 (EASYPACK SOLUTIONS S R L [IT], et al) [ID] 14-18 * abstract * * page 6, line 17 - page 12, line 24 * * page 14, line 6 - line 26; figures 11-13 * [Y] 1-13; | [IY]WO2009040629 (DIAPACK LTD [GB], et al) [I] 14-18 * abstract * * page 10, line 22 - page 12, line l; figures 10-12; claims 34,35 * [Y] 1-13; | [I]WO2013054169 (MEPAR SOCIETA A RESPONSABILITA LIMITATA [IT]) [I] 14-18 * abstract ** page 9, line 11 - page 10, line 3; figures 6,7 * |