02.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
19.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] |
12.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
07.06.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] |
24.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
17.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] |
10.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] |
09.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
09.02.2024 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
02.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] |
19.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] |
15.12.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] |
01.12.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] |
17.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] |
10.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] |
27.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
13.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] |
22.09.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.10.2023 [2023/43] |
03.03.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 05.04.2023 [2023/14] |
21.02.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
21.02.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
21.02.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
15.12.2022 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.09.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.09.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.05.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
27.11.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 30.12.2020 [2020/53] |
27.11.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 30.12.2020 [2020/53] |
30.10.2020 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] |
30.10.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] |
30.10.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] |
14.09.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.07.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] |
03.07.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] |
20.11.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.10.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.10.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
25.10.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.04.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.04.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|