Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020012673 | Global Dossier | 16.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018133724 | 13.07.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020012672 | Global Dossier | 16.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018133722 | 13.07.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020012671 | Global Dossier | 16.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018133721 | 13.07.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020012670 | Global Dossier | 16.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018133719 | 13.07.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019230011 | Global Dossier | 05.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018106519 | 01.06.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019065655 | Global Dossier | 04.04.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018106516 | 01.06.2018 | JP2018133719 | 13.07.2018 | JP2018106519 | 01.06.2018 | JP2017185378 | 26.09.2017 | JP2017185376 | 26.09.2017 | JP2018133722 | 13.07.2018 | JP2018133721 | 13.07.2018 | JP2018133724 | 13.07.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11724517 | Global Dossier | 15.08.2023 | B2 | US2021370687 | 02.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018106519 | 01.06.2018 | WO2018JP35519 | 25.09.2018 | US202117403186 | 16.08.2021 | US201916607130 | 22.10.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11400740 | Global Dossier | 02.08.2022 | B2 | US2021354490 | 18.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018133722 | 13.07.2018 | WO2018JP35522 | 25.09.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11358396 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2022 | B2 | US2021354479 | 18.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018JP35523 | 25.09.2018 | JP2018133724 | 13.07.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11279143 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2022 | B2 | US2021354478 | 18.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018133719 | 13.07.2018 | WO2018JP35520 | 25.09.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11235588 | Global Dossier | 01.02.2022 | B2 | US2021331486 | 28.10.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018JP35521 | 25.09.2018 | JP2018133721 | 13.07.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11110721 | Global Dossier | 07.09.2021 | B2 | US2021053365 | 25.02.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018106519 | 01.06.2018 | WO2018JP35519 | 25.09.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10981395 | Global Dossier | 20.04.2021 | B2 | US2020130365 | 30.04.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2017185378 | 26.09.2017 | WO2018JP35515 | 25.09.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10906327 | Global Dossier | 02.02.2021 | B2 | US2020047518 | 13.02.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018106516 | 01.06.2018 | JP2018133719 | 13.07.2018 | JP2018106519 | 01.06.2018 | JP2017185378 | 26.09.2017 | JP2017185376 | 26.09.2017 | JP2018133722 | 13.07.2018 | WO2018JP35518 | 25.09.2018 | JP2018133721 | 13.07.2018 | JP2018133724 | 13.07.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7121025B | Global Dossier | 17.08.2022 | B2 | JPWO2019065654 | 03.09.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2017185378 | 26.09.2017 | WO2018JP35515 | 25.09.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7073401B | Global Dossier | 23.05.2022 | B2 | JPWO2020012672 | 03.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018133722 | 13.07.2018 | WO2018JP35522 | 25.09.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7069214B | Global Dossier | 17.05.2022 | B2 | JPWO2019230011 | 13.05.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018106519 | 01.06.2018 | WO2018JP35519 | 25.09.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7064503B | Global Dossier | 10.05.2022 | B2 | JPWO2019065655 | 03.09.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018106516 | 01.06.2018 | JP2018133719 | 13.07.2018 | JP2018106519 | 01.06.2018 | JP2017185378 | 26.09.2017 | JP2017185376 | 26.09.2017 | JP2018133722 | 13.07.2018 | WO2018JP35518 | 25.09.2018 | JP2018133721 | 13.07.2018 | JP2018133724 | 13.07.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7057376B | Global Dossier | 19.04.2022 | B2 | JPWO2020012670 | 03.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018133719 | 13.07.2018 | WO2018JP35520 | 25.09.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7029473B | Global Dossier | 03.03.2022 | B2 | JPWO2020012671 | 03.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018JP35521 | 25.09.2018 | JP2018133721 | 13.07.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7029472B | Global Dossier | 03.03.2022 | B2 | JPWO2020012673 | 03.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018JP35523 | 25.09.2018 | JP2018133724 | 13.07.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7197740B | Global Dossier | 27.12.2022 | B2 | JP2022100408 | 05.07.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2018106519 | 01.06.2018 | WO2018JP35519 | 25.09.2018 | JP2019558808 | 25.09.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3822088 | Global Dossier | 26.04.2023 | B1 | EP3822088 | 01.09.2021 | A4 | EP3822088 | 19.05.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018133719 | 13.07.2018 | WO2018JP35520 | 25.09.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3822087 | Global Dossier | 26.04.2023 | B1 | EP3822087 | 04.08.2021 | A4 | EP3822087 | 19.05.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018JP35521 | 25.09.2018 | JP2018133721 | 13.07.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3804999 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2023 | B1 | EP3804999 | 29.12.2021 | A4 | EP3804999 | 14.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018106519 | 01.06.2018 | WO2018JP35519 | 25.09.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3689630 | Global Dossier | 23.02.2022 | B1 | EP3689630 | 25.11.2020 | A4 | EP3689630 | 05.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018106516 | 01.06.2018 | JP2018133719 | 13.07.2018 | JP2018106519 | 01.06.2018 | JP2017185378 | 26.09.2017 | JP2017185376 | 26.09.2017 | JP2018133722 | 13.07.2018 | WO2018JP35518 | 25.09.2018 | JP2018133721 | 13.07.2018 | JP2018133724 | 13.07.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111108001B | Global Dossier | 17.06.2022 | B | CN111108001 | 05.05.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2018133719 | 13.07.2018 | WO2018JP35520 | 25.09.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110997336B | Global Dossier | 12.03.2021 | B | CN110997336 | 10.04.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018JP35521 | 25.09.2018 | JP2018133721 | 13.07.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110896618B | Global Dossier | 25.06.2021 | B | CN110896618 | 20.03.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2018133722 | 13.07.2018 | WO2018JP35522 | 25.09.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110896617B | Global Dossier | 12.03.2021 | B | CN110896617 | 20.03.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018JP35523 | 25.09.2018 | JP2018133724 | 13.07.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110799342B | Global Dossier | 16.04.2021 | B | CN110799342 | 14.02.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2018106519 | 01.06.2018 | WO2018JP35519 | 25.09.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110582408B | Global Dossier | 04.06.2021 | B | CN110582408 | 17.12.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2017185378 | 26.09.2017 | WO2018JP35515 | 25.09.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110573349B | Global Dossier | 11.12.2020 | B | CN110573349 | 13.12.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2018106516 | 01.06.2018 | JP2018133719 | 13.07.2018 | JP2018106519 | 01.06.2018 | JP2017185378 | 26.09.2017 | JP2017185376 | 26.09.2017 | JP2018133722 | 13.07.2018 | WO2018JP35518 | 25.09.2018 | JP2018133721 | 13.07.2018 | JP2018133724 | 13.07.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3689626 | Global Dossier | 05.04.2023 | B1 | EP3689626 | 02.12.2020 | A4 | EP3689626 | 05.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2017185378 | 26.09.2017 | WO2018JP35515 | 25.09.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019065654 | Global Dossier | 04.04.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2017185378 | 26.09.2017 |