25.07.2024 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.03.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.12.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.07.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.07.2023 |
First examination report |
|
14.03.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.07.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
23.03.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.01.2022 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 26.01.2022 [2022/04] |
24.12.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.01.2022 [2022/04] |
24.12.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.01.2022 [2022/04] |
23.07.2021 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
23.07.2021 |
Change - extension states |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
14.05.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.02.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
19.02.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
29.01.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.01.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.12.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
21.12.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.12.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.12.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.12.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.12.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
02.12.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.11.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.11.2019 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|