Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019218372 | Global Dossier | 21.11.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN87581 | 18.05.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11472910 | Global Dossier | 18.10.2022 | B2 | US2021061939 | 04.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN87581 | 18.05.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7286678B | Global Dossier | 05.06.2023 | B2 | JP2021529842 | 04.11.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN87581 | 18.05.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN112135852B | Global Dossier | 08.11.2022 | B | CN112135852 | 25.12.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN87581 | 18.05.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3794048 | Global Dossier | 26.01.2022 | A4 | EP3794048 | 24.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN87581 | 18.05.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2020011821 | 09.02.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN87581 | 18.05.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2768646 | 24.03.2022 | C1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN87581 | 18.05.2018 |