EP3794048 - A POLYISOCYANATE COMPONENT, A POLYURETHANE FOAMING SYSTEM AND AN ARTICLE MADE THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | [2021/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FENG, Yanli No. 936 Zhangheng Road Zhangjiang Hi-Tech Park Shanghai 201213 / CN | 02 /
ZHOU, Weijun 230 Abner Jackson Parkway Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US | 03 /
BERTUCELLI, Luigi Via Carpi, 29 42015 Correggio / IT | 04 /
DUGGAL, Rajat 230 Abner Jackson Parkway Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US | 05 /
GU, Yibei 403 Topaz Street Redwood, CA 94062 / US | 06 /
LIU, Wei No. 936 Zhangheng Road Zhangjiang Hi-Tech Park Shanghai 201213 / CN | 07 /
MICHELETTI, Davide Via Carpi, 29 42015 Correggio / IT | [2021/12] | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [2021/12] | Application number, filing date | 18918783.4 | 18.05.2018 | [2021/12] | WO2018CN87581 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019218372 | Date: | 21.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3794048 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/58, C08G18/76, C08G18/78, C08G18/00, C08G18/42, C08G18/80 | [2022/04] | CPC: |
C08G18/7881 (EP);
C08G18/4225 (US);
B32B15/046 (US);
B32B15/095 (US);
B32B15/20 (US);
B32B5/20 (US);
C08G18/003 (EP,RU);
C08G18/42 (EP,RU);
C08G18/58 (RU);
C08G18/6407 (US);
C08G18/7664 (EP,RU,US);
C08G18/8019 (EP,US);
B32B2250/03 (US);
B32B2250/40 (US);
B32B2266/0278 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/12] | C08G18/58, C08G18/76 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/12] | Title | German: | POLYISOCYANATKOMPONENTE, POLYURETHANSCHÄUMUNGSSYSTEM UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTER ARTIKEL | [2021/12] | English: | A POLYISOCYANATE COMPONENT, A POLYURETHANE FOAMING SYSTEM AND AN ARTICLE MADE THEREFROM | [2021/12] | French: | CONSTITUANT POLYISOCYANATE, SYSTÈME DE MOUSSAGE DE POLYURÉTHANE ET ARTICLE FABRIQUÉ À PARTIR DE CE DERNIER | [2021/12] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 02.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/12] | 22.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4788224 (MUELLER HANNS P [DE], et al); | [XAI]US2014093721 (WEGENER DIRK [DE], et al); | [A]US2016090436 (PRISSOK FRANK [DE], et al); | [XAI]US9481776 (WEGENER DIRK [DE], et al) | International search | [X]US3313747 (SCHRAMM CHARLES H) [X] 1-15* description, column 4, line 52 to column 6, line 66 *; | [X]CN101268110 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * description, page 3, line 20 to page, 9 line 21 * | by applicant | US7714030 | WO2016131878 | US2017096575 | US2017275408 |