EP3649905 - CERAMIC PELLET GRILL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yang, Hongwei Yixing Haohong Ceramics Co., Ltd No.58 Middle Road of Chuanbu Dingshu, Yixing City Jiangsu 214222 / CN | For all designated states Yao, Xuemei RM1103 Building 3 No.1388 Feicui Rd Weitang town, Xiangcheng Dist Suzhou city / CN | [2023/43] |
Former [2020/20] | For all designated states Yang, Hongwei Yixing Haohong Ceramics Co., Ltd Shenhui Ceramic Industrial Park Yangzhu Village Dingshu Town, Yixing City Jiangsu 214226 / CN | ||
For all designated states Yao, Xuemei 17 No.703 Manhanttan Plaza Suzhou, Jiangsu 215000 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2020/20] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/43] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2020/20] | Jones, David Alan Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 7th Floor Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 19164318.8 | 21.03.2019 | [2020/20] | Priority number, date | CN201821832915U | 08.11.2018 Original published format: CN 201821832915 U | US201916267351 | 04.02.2019 Original published format: US201916267351 | [2020/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3649905 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3649905 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A47J37/07, F24B1/20 | [2020/20] | CPC: |
A47J37/0704 (EP);
A47J36/04 (US);
A47J37/0718 (US);
A47J37/0759 (US);
A47J37/0763 (US);
A47J37/0786 (EP);
F24B1/207 (US);
F24B1/22 (US);
F24B13/04 (EP,US);
F23B2700/013 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/51] |
Former [2020/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KERAMISCHER PELLETGRILL | [2020/20] | English: | CERAMIC PELLET GRILL | [2020/20] | French: | BARBECUE À GRANULÉS EN CÉRAMIQUE | [2020/20] | Examination procedure | 10.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2020 | Examination requested [2020/51] | 10.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/40] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to file a copy of earlier search results or a statement of non-availability | 09.02.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 09.02.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.02.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 25.10.2023 | ES | 25.10.2023 | HR | 25.10.2023 | PL | 25.10.2023 | RO | 25.10.2023 | RS | 25.10.2023 | SK | 25.10.2023 | SM | 25.10.2023 | NO | 25.01.2024 | GR | 26.01.2024 | IS | 25.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RO | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 25.10.2023 | |
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 25.10.2023 | |
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 26.01.2024 | |
IS | 25.02.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5429110 (BURKE TERRENCE M [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 59; figure 2 *; | [A]DE10002201 (RIENER KARL STEFAN [AT]) [A] 1-15 * column 3, line 25 - column 4, line 59; figures 1-5,7,9,10 * * column 7, lines 3-14 *; | [A]EP3239606 (RAVELLI S P A [IT]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0036] - [0045]; figures 1,3,4 * |