Dossier(s): EP3649905
Date | Document type | Number of pages | |
---|---|---|---|
Total number of pages: 62 | |||
13.05.2024 | Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and the additional fee | 2 | |
05.01.2024 | Transmission of the certificate for a European patent with unitary effect | 1 | |
02.01.2024 | Communication of registration of unitary effect | 2 | |
19.12.2023 | (Electronic) Receipt | 1 | |
19.12.2023 | Request for unitary effect | 3 | |
19.12.2023 | Translation of the patent | 46 | |
01.12.2023 | Invitation to remedy deficiencies in a request for unitary effect | 3 | |
24.11.2023 | (Electronic) Receipt | 1 | |
24.11.2023 | Request for unitary effect | 3 |