Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10989284 | Global Dossier | 27.04.2021 | B2 | US2019301574 | 03.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018061071 | 28.03.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2019172002 | Global Dossier | 10.10.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2018061071 | 28.03.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110316242B | Global Dossier | 10.12.2021 | B | CN110316242 | 11.10.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2018061071 | 28.03.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3546318 | Global Dossier | 02.06.2021 | B1 | EP3546318 | 02.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018061071 | 28.03.2018 |