19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
16.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] |
09.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
26.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] |
19.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] |
22.12.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.01.2024 [2024/04] |
10.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] |
10.11.2023 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] |
03.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] |
27.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
13.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] |
25.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.09.2023 [2023/39] |
18.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2023 [2023/38] |
11.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2023 [2023/37] |
04.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.09.2023 [2023/36] |
28.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] |
21.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.08.2023 [2023/34] |
14.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
30.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.08.2023 [2023/31] |
02.12.2022 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 04.01.2023 [2023/01] |
29.11.2022 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
29.11.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
29.11.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
29.09.2022 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.07.2022 |
Change - applicant |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
25.03.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.04.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
03.04.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
03.04.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.05.2021 [2021/18] |
03.04.2021 |
Change - designated states |
published on 05.05.2021 [2021/18] |
31.03.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.03.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
04.09.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.10.2020 [2020/41] |
05.04.2019 |
Change - representative |
|