Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11097420 | Global Dossier | 24.08.2021 | B2 | US2019351550 | 21.11.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018093928 | 15.05.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7119556B | Global Dossier | 17.08.2022 | B2 | JP2019198914 | 21.11.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2018093928 | 15.05.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110480624B | Global Dossier | 31.05.2022 | B | CN110480624 | 22.11.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2018093928 | 15.05.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3572192 | Global Dossier | 10.11.2021 | B1 | EP3572192 | 27.11.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018093928 | 15.05.2018 |