Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3593871 | Global Dossier | 17.02.2021 | B1 | EP3593871 | 15.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IT201800007106 | 11.07.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2869242T | 25.10.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | IT201800007106 | 11.07.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT201800007106 | 11.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IT201800007106 | 11.07.2018 |