EP3593871 - AUTOMATIC TENNIS COURT MAINTENANCE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.06.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STM Products S.r.l. Via Morgagni 14 37135 Verona (VR) / IT | [2020/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bertoni, Giovanni Via Segai 8 37023 Stallavena / IT | 02 /
Martini, Alessandro Via Salita XX Settembre 14 37129 Verona / IT | [2020/03] | Representative(s) | Münchow, Vera Ute Barbara C/o Adexe Srl Corso Porta Nuova, 131 37122 Verona (VR) / IT | [2020/03] | Application number, filing date | 19185366.2 | 10.07.2019 | [2020/03] | Priority number, date | IT20180007106 | 11.07.2018 Original published format: IT201800007106 | [2020/03] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3593871 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3593871 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A63C19/04, A63C19/12, // A63C19/06 | [2020/03] | CPC: |
A63C19/12 (EP);
A63C2019/067 (EP);
A63C2203/12 (EP);
A63C2203/22 (EP);
A63C2203/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/29] |
Former [2020/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHES TENNISPLATZWARTUNGSSYSTEM | [2020/03] | English: | AUTOMATIC TENNIS COURT MAINTENANCE SYSTEM | [2020/03] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MAINTENANCE AUTOMATIQUE DES COURTS DE TENNIS | [2020/03] | Examination procedure | 09.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/29] | 09.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.01.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.11.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/04] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.07.2019 | AL | 17.02.2021 | AT | 17.02.2021 | CY | 17.02.2021 | CZ | 17.02.2021 | DK | 17.02.2021 | EE | 17.02.2021 | FI | 17.02.2021 | HR | 17.02.2021 | LT | 17.02.2021 | LV | 17.02.2021 | MC | 17.02.2021 | MK | 17.02.2021 | MT | 17.02.2021 | NL | 17.02.2021 | PL | 17.02.2021 | RO | 17.02.2021 | RS | 17.02.2021 | SE | 17.02.2021 | SI | 17.02.2021 | SK | 17.02.2021 | SM | 17.02.2021 | TR | 17.02.2021 | BG | 17.05.2021 | NO | 17.05.2021 | GR | 18.05.2021 | IS | 17.06.2021 | PT | 17.06.2021 | IE | 10.07.2021 | LU | 10.07.2021 | BE | 31.07.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 10.07.2019 | |
AL | 17.02.2021 | ||
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CY | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
MK | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SI | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
TR | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
IE | 10.07.2021 | ||
LU | 10.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 10.07.2019 | |
AL | 17.02.2021 | ||
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CY | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
MK | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SI | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
IE | 10.07.2021 | ||
LU | 10.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 10.07.2019 | |
AL | 17.02.2021 | ||
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CY | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SI | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
IE | 10.07.2021 | ||
LU | 10.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CY | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SI | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
IE | 10.07.2021 | ||
LU | 10.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SI | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
IE | 10.07.2021 | ||
LU | 10.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SI | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
LU | 10.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SI | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
LU | 10.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SI | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SI | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 17.02.2021 | |
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 17.02.2021 | |
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 17.02.2021 | |
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 17.02.2021 | |
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 17.02.2021 | |
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | FI | 17.02.2021 | |
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | FI | 17.02.2021 | |
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 17.02.2021 | |
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 17.02.2021 | |
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 17.02.2021 | |
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 17.02.2021 | |
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 17.02.2021 | |
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2010054960 (BECOFLEX SA [BE], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 7, line 19 - page 7, line 28; figures 1,2 * * page 10, line 20 - page 10, line 23; figure 1 *; | [A]FR2803769 (GAUDON JEAN LUC [FR]) [A] 1-11 * page 6, line 21 - page 6, line 35; figure 1 *; | [A]US3108804 (WAGNER ARTHUR W) [A] 1-11 * column 3, line 24 - column 3, line 53; figures 1,3,4,6 *; | [A]WO2014068131 (BECOFLEX SA [BE]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0024] - [0026] - [0027] , [0033] , [0039]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR2586358 (PERRACINO FREDERIC [FR]) [A] 1-11 * page 1, line 4 - page 2, line 33; figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR2743502 (SARCEVIC VLADO [FR]) [A] 1-11 * page 3, line 102 - page 6, line 205; figures 11,12,13 * | by applicant | FR2586358 | WO2010054960 | FR2803769 | US3108804 | WO2014068131 | FR2743502 |