EP3609055 - INERTIAL ENERGY STORAGE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.12.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RTX Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2023/44] |
Former [2021/12] | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | ||
Former [2020/07] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROBERGE, Gary D. 31 Whitetail Way Tolland, CT Connecticut 06084 / US | [2020/07] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2020/07] | Application number, filing date | 19190369.9 | 06.08.2019 | [2020/07] | Priority number, date | US201816057362 | 07.08.2018 Original published format: US201816057362 | [2020/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3609055 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H02K7/02, // H02K7/10, H02K7/108, H02K7/116 | [2020/07] | CPC: |
H02K7/025 (EP,US);
B64D27/24 (US);
B64D35/04 (US);
B64D35/08 (US);
B64U50/34 (EP,US);
H02J15/00 (US);
B64D27/026 (US);
B64U20/92 (US);
B64U30/295 (EP);
B64U50/19 (EP,US);
H02K7/10 (EP);
H02K7/108 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/38] |
Former [2020/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRÄGHEITSENERGIESPEICHERVORRICHTUNG | [2020/07] | English: | INERTIAL ENERGY STORAGE DEVICE | [2020/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE D'ÉNERGIE INERTIELLE | [2020/07] | Examination procedure | 12.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/38] | 12.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US1774804 (CHARLES MARCUS); | [A]JPH1075504 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND); | [A]US2011088507 (FIELDS ZANE C [US]); | [A]EP2842869 (NABTESCO CORP [JP], et al); | [A]US9325217 (VELTRI JEFFREY ALLAN [US]); | [XI]CN105730446 (UNIV JIANGSU); | [XI]US2017163114 (GIERAS JACEK F [US], et al); | [A]US2018003263 (SANDERS SETH R [US], et al) |