EP3594453 - FEATHER SEAL ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.07.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2021/12] |
Former [2020/03] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PROPHETER-HINCKLEY, Tracy A. 32 Windy Hill Ln Rocky Hill, CT 06067 / US | 02 /
SANTORO, Stephanie 34 Crystalbrook Road Wolcott, CT 06716 / US | 03 /
PETRAKIS, Evan 14 Donna Lane West Haven, CT 06516 / US | [2020/03] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2020/03] | Application number, filing date | 19192813.4 | 16.01.2012 | [2020/03] | Priority number, date | US201113012025 | 24.01.2011 Original published format: US201113012025 | [2020/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3594453 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP3594453 | Date: | 19.02.2020 | [2020/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F01D11/00 | [2020/03] | CPC: |
F01D11/005 (EP,US);
F01D9/041 (EP,US);
F05D2240/11 (EP,US);
F05D2240/57 (EP,US);
F05D2260/201 (EP,US);
F05D2260/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/34] |
Former [2020/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FEDERDICHTUNGSANORDNUNG | [2020/03] | English: | FEATHER SEAL ASSEMBLY | [2020/03] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE JOINT À LANGUETTE | [2020/03] | Examination procedure | 15.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/34] | 15.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/48] | 15.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/48] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12151289.1 / EP2479384 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2022 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4767260 (CLEVENGER DOUGLAS H [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * columns 2,3 * * figures 1-3 *; | [XA]US4902198 (NORTH WILLIAM E [US]) [X] 1-5,11,13,14 * columns 3,4 * * figures 3-5 * [A] 6-10,12,15; | [X]US5221096 (HELDRETH MARK A [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,10,11,13,14 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9618025 (PRATT & WHITNEY CANADA [CA]) [X] 1,2,13,14 * pages 3,4 * * figures 2-4 *; | [A]US5709530 (CAHILL THOMAS R [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 26 ** figures 3-4 *; | [A]DE10306915 (ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD BADEN [CH]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0013] - [0021] * * figures 1-4 * |