02.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
12.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
24.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
24.05.2024 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
17.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] |
03.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
16.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] |
09.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
02.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] |
26.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] |
19.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] |
29.12.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.01.2024 [2024/05] |
16.06.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] |
09.06.2023 |
Change - inventor |
published on 12.07.2023 [2023/28] |
26.05.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
23.05.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
23.05.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
01.05.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.04.2023 |
Change - French title |
published on 24.05.2023 [2023/21] |
23.08.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.09.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
10.09.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.10.2021 [2021/41] |
10.09.2021 |
Change - designated states |
published on 13.10.2021 [2021/41] |
20.08.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.08.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
29.01.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
26.08.2019 |
Change - representative |
|