Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11154146 | Global Dossier | 26.10.2021 | B2 | US2021059436 | 04.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19193625 | 26.08.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6994088B | Global Dossier | 14.01.2022 | B2 | JP2021030069 | 01.03.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | EP19193625 | 26.08.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN112437406 | Global Dossier | 02.03.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | EP19193625 | 26.08.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3785575 | Global Dossier | 19.07.2023 | B1 | EP3785575 | 03.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19193625 | 26.08.2019 |