Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020082286 | Global Dossier | 12.03.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018170769 | 12.09.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7059151B | Global Dossier | 25.04.2022 | B2 | JP2020042645 | 19.03.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2018170769 | 12.09.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3624017 | Global Dossier | 18.03.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018170769 | 12.09.2018 |