EP3624017 - TIME SERIES DATA ANALYSIS APPARATUS, TIME SERIES DATA ANALYSIS METHOD AND TIME SERIES DATA ANALYSIS PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.07.2021 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2024 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [2020/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shibahara, Takuma Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8280 / JP | 02 /
Suzuki, Mayumi Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8280 / JP | 03 /
Yamashita, Yasuho Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8280 / JP | [2020/12] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2020/12] | Application number, filing date | 19194591.4 | 30.08.2019 | [2020/12] | Priority number, date | JP20180170769 | 12.09.2018 Original published format: JP 2018170769 | [2020/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3624017 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/04, G06N5/04, G06N3/08 | [2020/12] | CPC: |
G06N5/045 (EP,US);
G06N3/042 (EP);
G06N3/044 (EP);
G06N3/045 (EP);
G06N3/049 (US);
G06N3/08 (EP);
G06N3/082 (US);
G16H50/30 (EP);
G16H50/70 (EP);
G16H40/20 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZEITREIHENDATENANALYSEVORRICHTUNG, ZEITREIHENDATENANALYSEVERFAHREN UND ZEITREIHENDATENANALYSEPROGRAMM | [2020/12] | English: | TIME SERIES DATA ANALYSIS APPARATUS, TIME SERIES DATA ANALYSIS METHOD AND TIME SERIES DATA ANALYSIS PROGRAM | [2020/12] | French: | APPAREIL, PROCÉDÉ ET PROGRAMME D'ANALYSE DE DONNÉES DE SÉRIE CHRONOLOGIQUE | [2020/12] | Examination procedure | 30.08.2019 | Examination requested [2020/12] | 10.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2017032241 (CORRADO GREGORY SEAN [US], et al); | [I]US2018158552 (LIU YAN [US], et al) | by applicant | JP2018170769 |