Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
25.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.09.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
11.03.2022 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
20.11.2021 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
19.11.2021 | First examination report | |
16.10.2021 | Change - representative | |
28.09.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.10.2020 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
23.10.2020 | Request for examination filed | published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] |
23.10.2020 | Change - designated states | published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] |
19.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant | |
20.03.2020 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
24.09.2019 | Change - representative |