Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12067877 | Global Dossier | 20.08.2024 | B2 | US2023252897 | 10.08.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816165385 | 19.10.2018 | US202217692794 | 11.03.2022 | US202318304864 | 21.04.2023 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11670168 | Global Dossier | 06.06.2023 | B2 | US2022198926 | 23.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816165385 | 19.10.2018 | US202217692794 | 11.03.2022 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11295617 | Global Dossier | 05.04.2022 | B2 | US2020126416 | 23.04.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816165385 | 19.10.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3640912 | Global Dossier | 22.04.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816165385 | 19.10.2018 |