Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11231241 | Global Dossier | 25.01.2022 | B2 | US2020132401 | 30.04.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1859811 | 24.10.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111089503 | Global Dossier | 01.05.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | FR1859811 | 24.10.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3644007 | Global Dossier | 21.04.2021 | B1 | EP3644007 | 29.04.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1859811 | 24.10.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR3087881 | 25.09.2020 | B1 | FR3087881 | 01.05.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1859811 | 24.10.2018 |