EP3808508 - ADAPTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.04.2022 [2022/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Feldkircherstr. 100 9494 Schaan / LI | [2021/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nitzschner, Michael Reeseallee 35 86156 Augsburg / DE | 02 /
Venkatraman, Muralidhar Ilzbogen 1 86916 Kaufering / DE | 03 /
Janczyk, Leonard Schwaighofstraße 63 86899 Landsberg am Lech / DE | [2021/16] | Representative(s) | Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | [2021/16] | Application number, filing date | 19203585.5 | 16.10.2019 | [2021/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3808508 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B25F5/00, H02J7/00 | [2021/16] | CPC: |
B25F5/00 (EP,US);
H02J7/0045 (US);
H02J7/0029 (EP,US);
H02J7/0031 (EP);
H02J7/0047 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ADAPTER | [2021/16] | English: | ADAPTOR | [2021/16] | French: | ADAPTATEUR | [2021/16] | Examination procedure | 22.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/16] | 29.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2011197389 (OTA TOMOYUKI [JP], et al); | [X]WO2014014128 (HITACHI KOKI KK [JP]); | [XI]US2018054032 (PELOQUIN RYAN H [US], et al) |