13.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] |
14.06.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] |
03.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
14.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
23.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
02.12.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.01.2023 [2023/01] |
28.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] |
14.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2022 [2022/46] |
15.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
06.05.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
04.03.2022 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 06.04.2022 [2022/14] |
11.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] |
04.02.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
28.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] |
21.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
14.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
26.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.12.2021 [2021/52] |
19.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.12.2021 [2021/51] |
12.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] |
05.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.12.2021 [2021/49] |
23.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.11.2021 [2021/47] |
21.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] |
26.03.2021 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.04.2021 [2021/17] |
19.02.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
19.02.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
19.02.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
10.12.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.11.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 30.12.2020 [2020/53] |
27.11.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 30.12.2020 [2020/53] |
22.05.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
22.05.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
14.12.2019 |
Change - representative |
|