Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10944077 | Global Dossier | 09.03.2021 | B2 | US2020203662 | 25.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1873304 | 19.12.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20200076635 | Global Dossier | 29.06.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | FR1873304 | 19.12.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7516038B | Global Dossier | 16.07.2024 | B2 | JP2020126828 | 20.08.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | FR1873304 | 19.12.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111341943B | Global Dossier | 08.03.2024 | B | CN111341943 | 26.06.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | FR1873304 | 19.12.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3671849 | Global Dossier | 28.04.2021 | B1 | EP3671849 | 24.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1873304 | 19.12.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR3091035 | 04.12.2020 | B1 | FR3091035 | 26.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1873304 | 19.12.2018 |