Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3712739
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
30.08.2024 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] |
28.08.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
28.08.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
27.08.2024 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
11.07.2024 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.04.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.04.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.10.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.10.2022 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.05.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.05.2022 |
First examination report |
|
02.04.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.11.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
28.10.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
03.04.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.03.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
26.03.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.04.2021 [2021/17] |
26.03.2021 |
Change - designated states |
published on 28.04.2021 [2021/17] |
15.03.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
08.02.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
21.08.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.09.2020 [2020/39] |
02.04.2019 |
Change - representative |
|