27.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] |
03.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
19.05.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.06.2023 [2023/25] |
21.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.05.2023 [2023/21] |
14.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.05.2023 [2023/20] |
03.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] |
20.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.02.2023 [2023/08] |
20.01.2023 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 22.02.2023 [2023/08] |
13.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2023 [2023/07] |
06.01.2023 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 08.02.2023 [2023/06] |
02.12.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.01.2023 [2023/01] |
18.11.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.12.2022 [2022/51] |
11.11.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.12.2022 [2022/50] |
04.11.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2022 [2022/49] |
28.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] |
21.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.11.2022 [2022/47] |
30.09.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.11.2022 [2022/44] |
26.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.09.2022 [2022/39] |
12.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.09.2022 [2022/37] |
05.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
29.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] |
15.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
11.02.2022 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] |
31.01.2022 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
14.01.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
14.01.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
22.09.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.06.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.07.2020 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
31.07.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
31.07.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
31.07.2020 |
Change - designated states |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
10.01.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] |
09.07.2019 |
Change - representative |
|