Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11396426 | Global Dossier | 26.07.2022 | B2 | US2020048002 | 13.02.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | PL42659018 | 07.08.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3608260 | Global Dossier | 16.03.2022 | B1 | EP3608260 | 12.02.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | PL42659018 | 07.08.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2918210T | 14.07.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | PL42659018 | 07.08.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE058859T | 28.09.2022 | T2 | Priority number | Date | PL42659018 | 07.08.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL238377B | 16.08.2021 | B1 | PL426590 | 15.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | PL42659018 | 07.08.2018 |