Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3737671 | Global Dossier | 17.11.2021 | B1 | EP3737671 | 18.11.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | HUP1800007 | 12.01.2018 | WO2019IB50213 | 11.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1125018T | 24.03.2023 | T1 | Priority number | Date | HUP1800007 | 12.01.2018 | WO2019IB50213 | 11.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3737671T | 24.01.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | HUP1800007 | 12.01.2018 | WO2019IB50213 | 11.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA202091628 | 02.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | HUP1800007 | 12.01.2018 | WO2019IB50213 | 11.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2902396T | 28.03.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | HUP1800007 | 12.01.2018 | WO2019IB50213 | 11.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20220219T | 29.04.2022 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP19705818 | 11.01.2019 | HUP1800007 | 12.01.2018 | WO2019IB50213 | 11.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | LT3737671T | 10.01.2022 | T | Priority number | Date | HUP1800007 | 12.01.2018 | WO2019IB50213 | 11.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3737671T | 07.03.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP19705818 | 11.01.2019 | HUP1800007 | 12.01.2018 | WO2019IB50213 | 11.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RS62776 | 31.01.2022 | B1 | Priority number | Date | EP19705818 | 11.01.2019 | HUP1800007 | 12.01.2018 | WO2019IB50213 | 11.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI3737671T | 28.02.2022 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP19705818 | 11.01.2019 | HUP1800007 | 12.01.2018 | WO2019IB50213 | 11.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA126772 | 01.02.2023 | C2 | Priority number | Date | HUP1800007 | 12.01.2018 | WO2019IB50213 | 11.01.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019138362 | Global Dossier | 18.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | HUP1800007 | 12.01.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GEP20237498 | 10.04.2023 | B | Priority number | Date | HUP1800007 | 12.01.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU231119 | 30.11.2020 | B1 | HUP1800007 | 29.07.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | HUP1800007 | 12.01.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE057167T | 28.04.2022 | T4 | HUE057167T | 28.04.2022 | T2 | Priority number | Date | HUP1800007 | 12.01.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT3737671T | 24.12.2021 | T | Priority number | Date | HUP1800007 | 12.01.2018 |