EP3737671 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF 4-(4-AMINOPHENYL)MORPHOLIN-3-ONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.08.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.10.2022 [2022/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Richter Gedeon Nyrt. Gyömröi út 19-21 1103 Budapest / HU | [2020/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SZABÓ, Tamás Hungária út 1. 2510 Dorog / HU | 02 /
NEU, József Hegedüs Gyula u. 44/B. 1133 Budapest / HU | 03 /
GARADNAY, Sándor Lángliliom u. 3/B. 1037 Budapest / HU | [2021/46] |
Former [2020/47] | 01 /
SZABÓ, Tamás Hungária út 1. 2510 Dorog / HU | ||
02 /
NEU, József Heged s Gyula u. 44/B. 1133 Budapest / HU | |||
03 /
GARADNAY, Sándor Lángliliom u. 3/B. 1037 Budapest / HU | Representative(s) | Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Waidmarkt 11 50676 Köln / DE | [2020/47] | Application number, filing date | 19705818.3 | 11.01.2019 | [2020/47] | WO2019IB50213 | Priority number, date | HU20180000007 | 12.01.2018 Original published format: HU 1800007 | [2020/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019138362 | Date: | 18.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3737671 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3737671 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07D265/32, C07C231/02, C07C51/29, C07C59/135, C07C235/16 | [2021/36] | CPC: |
C07D265/32 (EP,HU);
C07C231/02 (EP);
C07C51/29 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C231/02, C07C235/16 (EP);
C07C51/29, C07C59/135 (EP) |
Former IPC [2020/47] | C07D265/32, C07C231/02, C07C51/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 4-(4-AMINOPHENYL)MORPHOLIN-3-ON | [2020/47] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF 4-(4-AMINOPHENYL)MORPHOLIN-3-ONE | [2020/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE 4-(4-AMINOPHÉNYL)MORPHOLIN-3-ONE | [2020/47] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/47] | 12.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.10.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SM | 17.11.2021 | [2022/33] | Cited in | International search | [A]CN102464580 (CHONGQING HUABANG SHENGKAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * example 1 *; | [A]CN104098525 (SHANGHAI SYNCORES TECHNOLOGIES INC) [A] 1-5* Method 2) *; | [A] - ANIL C MALI ET AL, "Facile approach for the synthesis of rivaroxaban using alternate synthon: reaction, crystallization and isolation in single pot to achieve desired yield, quality and crystal form", SUSTAINABLE CHEMICAL PROCESSES, (20150713), vol. 48, no. 1, doi:10.1186/s40508-015-0036-3, page 5900, XP055230109 [A] 1-5 * scheme 3; page 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/s40508-015-0036-3 | by applicant | EP164O373 | US2003153610 | WO2005026135 | WO2008075152 | - MEDERSKI et al., Bioorganic & Medicinal Chemistry Letters, (20040000), vol. 14, pages 58 17 - 5822 | - MALI et al., Sustain Chem. Process, (20150000), vol. 3, page 11 | - Bioorganic & Medicinal Chemistry Letters, (20040000), vol. 14, pages 5817 - 5822 |