Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11528718 | Global Dossier | 13.12.2022 | B2 | US2021160892 | 27.05.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202117163797 | 01.02.2021 | US201916276101 | 14.02.2019 | US201862710336 | 16.02.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111886919B | Global Dossier | 02.04.2024 | B | CN111886919 | 03.11.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US18147 | 15.02.2019 | US201916276101 | 14.02.2019 | US201862710336 | 16.02.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3753365 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2023 | B1 | EP3753365 | 23.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US18147 | 15.02.2019 | US201916276101 | 14.02.2019 | US201862710336 | 16.02.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019161154 | Global Dossier | 22.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916276101 | 14.02.2019 | US201862710336 | 16.02.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10912097 | Global Dossier | 02.02.2021 | B2 | US2019261382 | 22.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916276101 | 14.02.2019 | US201862710336 | 16.02.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI804577B | 11.06.2023 | B | TW201937966 | 16.09.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201916276101 | 14.02.2019 | US201862710336 | 16.02.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW202337259 | 16.09.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US201916276101 | 14.02.2019 | US201862710336 | 16.02.2018 |