EP3753365 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRIORITY CLASS INDICATION FOR BASE STATION MCOT SHARING FOR AUL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.08.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2020/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TIAN, Qingjiang c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
YERRAMALLI, Srinivas c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
ZHANG, Xiaoxia c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
SUN, Jing c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
LIU, Chih-Hao c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2020/52] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [2023/12] |
Former [2020/52] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19709179.6 | 15.02.2019 | [2020/52] | WO2019US18147 | Priority number, date | US201862710336P | 16.02.2018 Original published format: US 201862710336 P | US201916276101 | 14.02.2019 Original published format: US201916276101 | [2020/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019161154 | Date: | 22.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3753365 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3753365 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/08 | [2020/52] | CPC: |
H04W74/0808 (EP,US);
H04W72/56 (US);
H04W72/20 (US);
H04W74/04 (EP,US);
H04W88/02 (US);
H04W88/08 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR PRIORITÄTSKLASSENANZEIGE FÜR GEMEINSAME MCOT-NUTZUNG EINER BASISSTATION FÜR AUL | [2020/52] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRIORITY CLASS INDICATION FOR BASE STATION MCOT SHARING FOR AUL | [2020/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'INDICATION DE CLASSE DE PRIORITÉ D'UN PARTAGE DE MCOT DE STATION DE BASE POUR UNE AUL | [2020/52] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/52] | 14.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.03.2023 | CZ | 22.03.2023 | DK | 22.03.2023 | EE | 22.03.2023 | ES | 22.03.2023 | FI | 22.03.2023 | HR | 22.03.2023 | IT | 22.03.2023 | LT | 22.03.2023 | LV | 22.03.2023 | PL | 22.03.2023 | RO | 22.03.2023 | RS | 22.03.2023 | SE | 22.03.2023 | SI | 22.03.2023 | SK | 22.03.2023 | SM | 22.03.2023 | NO | 22.06.2023 | GR | 23.06.2023 | IS | 22.07.2023 | PT | 24.07.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/10] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
CZ | 22.03.2023 | ||
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 22.03.2023 | |
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 22.03.2023 | |
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 22.03.2023 | |
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 22.03.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2016200546 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0073] *; | [A]US2017238342 (YANG WEIDONG [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0033] ** paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036] *; | [XP]WO2018075745 (INTEL CORP [US]) [XP] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0093] * * paragraph [0100] *; | [XA] - INTEL CORPORATION, "A framework to enable autonomous uplink access", vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, P.R. Czechia; 20170821 - 20170825, (20170820), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1712478, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170820), XP051315294 [X] 1,2,9-12 * abstract * * paragraph [002.] * * paragraph [03.2] - paragraph [04.2] * [A] 3-8 |