Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3784622
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
15.04.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.09.2023 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
15.09.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.06.2023 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
01.03.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.07.2021 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 04.08.2021 [2021/31] |
02.07.2021 |
Change - extension states |
published on 04.08.2021 [2021/31] |
04.06.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
26.03.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.01.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
29.01.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
29.01.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
05.01.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.12.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.11.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.11.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.11.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
13.11.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.09.2020 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
01.11.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.11.2019 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
11.05.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|