Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11505465 | Global Dossier | 22.11.2022 | B2 | US2021130172 | 06.05.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ES201830402 | 25.04.2018 | WO2019EP60500 | 24.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20210003733 | Global Dossier | 12.01.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | ES201830402 | 25.04.2018 | WO2019EP60500 | 24.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2021521091 | Global Dossier | 26.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | ES201830402 | 25.04.2018 | WO2019EP60500 | 24.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN112041266 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | ES201830402 | 25.04.2018 | WO2019EP60500 | 24.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3784622 | Global Dossier | 03.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ES201830402 | 25.04.2018 | WO2019EP60500 | 24.04.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019206989 | Global Dossier | 31.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ES201830402 | 25.04.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2678419 | 29.11.2018 | B2 | ES2678419 | 10.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ES201830402 | 25.04.2018 |