EP3784622 - METHOD OF OBTAINMENT OF NANOMATERIALS COMPOSED OF CARBONACEOUS MATERIAL AND METAL OXIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.01.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gnanomat SL Parque Cientifico de Madrid Campus de Cantoblanco Calle Faraday 7 28049 Madrid / ES | [2021/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEARA MARTÍNEZ, Maria c/o Gnanomat SL Calle Faraday 7 28049 Madrid / ES | 02 /
GARCÍA GÓMEZ, Alejandra c/o Gnanomat SL Calle Faraday 7 28049 Madrid / ES | 03 /
LARRAZA ÁLVAREZ, Iñigo c/o Gnanomat SL Calle Faraday 7 28049 Madrid / ES | 04 /
PEÑA MARTÍN, Elisa c/o Gnanomat SL Calle Faraday 7 28049 Madrid / ES | 05 /
BLANCO LÓPEZ, Víctor c/o Gnanomat SL Calle Faraday 7 28049 Madrid / ES | 06 /
RUIZ MARTÍNEZ-ALCOCER, Sara c/o Gnanomat SL Calle Faraday 7 28049 Madrid / ES | [2021/09] | Representative(s) | Maidment, Marc, et al Albright IP Limited County House Bayshill Road Cheltenham, Glos. GL50 3BA / GB | [2021/09] | Application number, filing date | 19720819.2 | 24.04.2019 | [2021/09] | WO2019EP60500 | Priority number, date | ES20180030402 | 25.04.2018 Original published format: ES 201830402 | [2021/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019206989 | Date: | 31.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3784622 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C01B32/15, C01B32/182 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
C01B32/15 (EP,ES,KR);
C01B32/184 (US);
B82Y30/00 (ES,KR,US);
B82Y40/00 (ES,KR,US);
C01B32/182 (EP,KR);
C01P2004/64 (KR);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/09] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON NANOMATERIALIEN AUS KOHLENSTOFFHALTIGEM MATERIAL UND METALLOXIDEN | [2021/09] | English: | METHOD OF OBTAINMENT OF NANOMATERIALS COMPOSED OF CARBONACEOUS MATERIAL AND METAL OXIDES | [2021/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'OBTENTION DE NANOMATÉRIAUX COMPOSÉS D'UN MATÉRIAU CARBONÉ ET D'OXYDES MÉTALLIQUES | [2021/09] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/09] | 12.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2023 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   15.09.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US9145302 (CHOI WON KOOK [KR], et al) [X] 13* example 2 *; | [XI]EP3050844 (CONSEJO SUPERIOR INVESTIGACION [ES]) [X] 13 * example 6; claim 41 * [I] 1-12; | [X]CN105289515B (UNIV ANHUI NORMAL) [X] 13 * example 1d * |