Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3801201
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
06.08.2024 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.06.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.11.2022 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
22.11.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.08.2022 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
13.08.2021 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] |
13.08.2021 |
Change - extension states |
published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] |
16.07.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.07.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.03.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] |
12.03.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
12.03.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] |
22.02.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.02.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.01.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.01.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
05.01.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.06.2020 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
02.03.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.02.2020 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
14.12.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.12.2019 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
18.06.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|