EP3801201 - MEASURING SURFACE DISTANCES ON HUMAN BODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIZEY OY Metsänneidonkuja 6 02130 Espoo / FI | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kämäräinen, Joni c/o Tampere University of Technology Department of Signal Processing P.O.Box 553 33101 Tampere / FI | 02 /
Yan, Song Väinämöisenkatu 11 D 352 33540 Tampere / FI | 03 /
Wirta, Johan c/o NOMO Technologies Oy Metsänneidonkuja 6 02130 Espoo / FI | [2021/15] | Representative(s) | Papula Oy P.O. Box 981 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2021/15] | Application number, filing date | 19729327.7 | 03.06.2019 | [2021/15] | WO2019FI50422 | Priority number, date | FI20180005517 | 06.06.2018 Original published format: FI 20185517 | [2021/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019234293 | Date: | 12.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3801201 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B5/107, G06T7/60 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
G06T7/60 (EP,US);
G06T7/30 (FI);
A61B5/0064 (EP);
A61B5/1072 (EP);
A61B5/1077 (EP);
A61B5/1079 (EP);
G06F18/22 (FI);
G06Q30/0601 (FI);
G06T17/20 (FI,US);
G06T19/20 (FI);
G06V20/64 (FI);
G06T2207/10028 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30196 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Title | German: | MESSUNG VON OBERFLÄCHENABSTÄNDEN AN MENSCHLICHEN KÖRPERN | [2021/15] | English: | MEASURING SURFACE DISTANCES ON HUMAN BODIES | [2021/15] | French: | MESURE DE DISTANCES DE SURFACE SUR DES CORPS HUMAINS | [2021/15] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 05.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2022 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   22.11.2022 | 30.06.2024 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI] - TSOLI AGGELIKI ET AL, "Model-based anthropometry: Predicting measurements from 3D human scans in multiple poses", IEEE WINTER CONFERENCE ON APPLICATIONS OF COMPUTER VISION, IEEE, (20140324), doi:10.1109/WACV.2014.6836115, pages 83 - 90, XP032609898 [X] 1-5,7,12-15 * abstract * * sections 3. Measurement from 3D scan; 3.1. Registration; 3.2. Feature Extraction * [Y] 8-11 [I] 6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/WACV.2014.6836115 | [Y] - PROBST THOMAS ET AL, "Efficient Model-Free Anthropometry from Depth Data", 2017 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON 3D VISION (3DV), IEEE, (20171010), doi:10.1109/3DV.2017.00062, pages 486 - 495, XP033353220 [Y] 8-11 * abstract * * (section 2. Related Work * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/3DV.2017.00062 | [A] - ALEXANDER WEISS ET AL, "Home 3D body scans from noisy image and range data", COMPUTER VISION (ICCV), 2011 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20111106), doi:10.1109/ICCV.2011.6126465, ISBN 978-1-4577-1101-5, pages 1951 - 1958, XP032101418 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCV.2011.6126465 | [A] - HUANG H Q ET AL, "Block pattern generation: From parameterizing human bodies to fit feature-aligned and flattenable 3D garments", COMPUTERS IN INDUSTRY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 63, no. 7, doi:10.1016/J.COMPIND.2012.04.001, ISSN 0166-3615, (20120403), pages 680 - 691, (20120417), XP028401077 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * section 3.3. Wireframe formation and ease distribution * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.compind.2012.04.001 | [A] - WANG C C L ED - HORNUNG CHRISTOPH ET AL, "CyberTape: an interactive measurement tool on polyhedral surface", COMPUTERS AND GRAPHICS, ELSEVIER, GB, (20041001), vol. 28, no. 5, doi:10.1016/J.CAG.2004.06.011, ISSN 0097-8493, pages 731 - 745, XP004526645 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * section: 4. Stretching simulation * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cag.2004.06.011 | [A] - XIAOZHI LI ET AL, "Human Body Dimensions Extraction from 3D Scan Data", INTELLIGENT COMPUTATION TECHNOLOGY AND AUTOMATION (ICICTA), 2010 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100511), ISBN 978-1-4244-7279-6, pages 441 - 444, XP031715709 [A] 1,14,15 * abstract * | by applicant | US2016203361 |