Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3853227
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
26.01.2024 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] |
25.10.2023 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
18.08.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.07.2023 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.03.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.03.2023 |
First examination report |
|
17.08.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.12.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
26.11.2021 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 29.12.2021 [2021/52] |
26.11.2021 |
Change - extension states |
published on 29.12.2021 [2021/52] |
18.08.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.06.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.07.2021 [2021/30] |
25.06.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
25.06.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.07.2021 [2021/30] |
31.05.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.05.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.04.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.04.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
16.04.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.03.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.03.2020 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
21.10.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.09.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|