Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022071970 | Global Dossier | 10.03.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP75278 | 20.09.2019 | EP18195621 | 20.09.2018 | EP18197436 | 28.09.2018 | EP18196157 | 24.09.2018 | EP18196777 | 26.09.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20210062044 | Global Dossier | 28.05.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP75278 | 20.09.2019 | EP18195621 | 20.09.2018 | EP18197436 | 28.09.2018 | EP18196157 | 24.09.2018 | EP18196777 | 26.09.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2022500471 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP75278 | 20.09.2019 | EP18195621 | 20.09.2018 | EP18197436 | 28.09.2018 | EP18196157 | 24.09.2018 | EP18196777 | 26.09.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL281495 | Global Dossier | 29.04.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP75278 | 20.09.2019 | EP18195621 | 20.09.2018 | EP18197436 | 28.09.2018 | EP18196157 | 24.09.2018 | EP18196777 | 26.09.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN112771041 | Global Dossier | 07.05.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP75278 | 20.09.2019 | EP18195621 | 20.09.2018 | EP18197436 | 28.09.2018 | EP18196157 | 24.09.2018 | EP18196777 | 26.09.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3111356 | Global Dossier | 26.03.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP75278 | 20.09.2019 | EP18195621 | 20.09.2018 | EP18197436 | 28.09.2018 | EP18196157 | 24.09.2018 | EP18196777 | 26.09.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2019341579 | Global Dossier | 13.05.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP75278 | 20.09.2019 | EP18195621 | 20.09.2018 | EP18197436 | 28.09.2018 | EP18196157 | 24.09.2018 | EP18196777 | 26.09.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3853227 | Global Dossier | 28.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP75278 | 20.09.2019 | EP18195621 | 20.09.2018 | EP18197436 | 28.09.2018 | EP18196157 | 24.09.2018 | EP18196777 | 26.09.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112021005171 | 15.06.2021 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP75278 | 20.09.2019 | EP18195621 | 20.09.2018 | EP18197436 | 28.09.2018 | EP18196157 | 24.09.2018 | EP18196777 | 26.09.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11202102338T | 29.04.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP75278 | 20.09.2019 | EP18195621 | 20.09.2018 | EP18197436 | 28.09.2018 | EP18196157 | 24.09.2018 | EP18196777 | 26.09.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020058458 | Global Dossier | 26.03.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18195621 | 20.09.2018 | EP18197436 | 28.09.2018 | EP18196157 | 24.09.2018 | EP18196777 | 26.09.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW202035398 | 01.10.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | EP18195621 | 20.09.2018 | EP18197436 | 28.09.2018 | EP18196157 | 24.09.2018 | EP18196777 | 26.09.2018 |