|
12.01.2024 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2023 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2023 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.01.2023 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2023 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.2023 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.01.2023 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.01.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2023 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.01.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2023 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2022 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2022 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.11.2022 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.11.2022 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2022 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
29.11.2022 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
02.11.2022 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2022 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2022 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.03.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.03.2022 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
03.03.2022 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
03.03.2022 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.03.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2022 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2022 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
02.02.2022 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-reply to Written Opinion) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2021 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2021 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.06.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2021 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.02.2021 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.02.2021 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
24.04.2020 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
24.04.2020 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
24.04.2020 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
24.04.2020 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
11.10.2019 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Communication in Cases for Which No Other Form Is Applicable (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
5 |