17.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] |
01.03.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] |
09.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
12.01.2024 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 14.02.2024 [2024/07] |
10.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] |
13.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] |
21.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.08.2023 [2023/34] |
03.02.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] |
23.01.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
23.01.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
23.01.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
20.01.2023 |
Change - applicant |
published on 22.02.2023 [2023/08] |
28.11.2022 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.11.2022 |
Change - German title |
published on 07.12.2022 [2022/49] |
04.11.2022 |
Change - French title |
published on 07.12.2022 [2022/49] |
30.09.2022 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 02.11.2022 [2022/44] |
30.09.2022 |
Change - extension states |
published on 02.11.2022 [2022/44] |
16.05.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.03.2022 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
05.03.2022 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
05.03.2022 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
04.03.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
03.02.2022 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
20.08.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] |
20.08.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
20.08.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] |
15.07.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.06.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.06.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.06.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
18.06.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.02.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.02.2021 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
20.04.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.10.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|