EP3880958 - A DEVICE FOR WIND TURBINE BLADE AND TOWER MAINTENANCE AND A SYSTEM FOR RAISING AND LOWERING THE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): EE, GB | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aerones Engineering, SIA Katlakalna iela 11 1073 Riga / LV | [2023/08] |
Former [2021/38] | For all designated states Aerones, Sia Katlakalna iela 11 1073 Riga / LV | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PUTRAMS, Janis Reznas iela 10-1 1019 Riga / LV | [2021/38] | Representative(s) | Fortuna, Jevgenijs Foral Patent Law Offices Kaleju iela 14-7 1050 Riga / LV | [N/P] |
Former [2021/38] | Fortuna, Jevgenijs Foral Patent Law Office Kaleju iela 14-7 1050 Riga / LV | Application number, filing date | 19779097.5 | 26.07.2019 | [2021/38] | WO2019IB56393 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021019274 | Date: | 04.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3880958 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3880958 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F03D80/50 | [2021/38] | CPC: |
F03D80/50 (EP);
F03D80/55 (US);
F03D1/0675 (US);
F05B2230/80 (EP,US);
Y02E10/72 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINE VORRICHTUNG ZUR WARTUNG VON WINDTURBINENBLÄTTERN UND -TÜRMEN UND EIN SYSTEM ZUM HEBEN UND SENKEN DER VORRICHTUNG | [2022/49] | English: | A DEVICE FOR WIND TURBINE BLADE AND TOWER MAINTENANCE AND A SYSTEM FOR RAISING AND LOWERING THE DEVICE | [2021/38] | French: | UN DISPOSITIF POUR L'ENTRETIEN DES PALES ET DES TOURS DES ÉOLIENNES ET UN SYSTÈME PERMETTANT DE LEVER ET D'ABAISSER LE DISPOSITIF | [2022/49] |
Former [2021/38] | VORRICHTUNG FÜR WINDTURBINENBLATT- UND -TURMWARTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUM HEBEN UND SENKEN DER VORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2021/38] | DISPOSITIF POUR L'ENTRETIEN DE PALE ET DE TOUR D'ÉOLIENNE ET SYSTÈME DE LEVÉE ET D'ABAISSEMENT DU DISPOSITIF | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/38] | 16.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.02.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 03.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/07] | Request for further processing for: | 03.03.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 03.03.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.03.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | MC | 08.03.2023 | RS | 08.03.2023 | SI | 08.03.2023 | SK | 08.03.2023 | SM | 08.03.2023 | GB | 26.07.2023 | EE | 31.07.2023 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/14] | MC | 08.03.2023 | |
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SI | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | RS | 08.03.2023 | |
SI | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | RS | 08.03.2023 | |
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | RS | 08.03.2023 | |
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | RS | 08.03.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2011140060 (OLSON STEVEN HAINES [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0023]; figure 6 *; | [A]KR101592904B (DOOSAN HEAVY IND & CONSTRUCTION CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1* figures 7-10 *; | [A]WO2019068299 (ROPE ROBOTICS APS [DK]) [A] 1-10 * figures 2a-5b * | by applicant | EP1517033 | WO2011107087 | US8544484 | EP2752621 | US9624901 |