EP3870998 - ACOUSTIC TRANSMITTING ANTENNA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | 20.06.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THALES 4 Rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [2024/30] |
Former [2021/35] | For all designated states THALES Tour Carpe Diem Place des Corolles - Esplanade Nord 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAGIER, Yves Chez TDMS UWS 525, route des Dolines 06903 SOPHIA ANTIPOLIS / FR | 02 /
LARDAT, Raphaël Chez TDMS UWS 525, route des Dolines 06903 SOPHIA ANTIPOLIS / FR | 03 /
TODESCO, Jérémie Chez TDMS UWS 525, route des Dolines 06903 SOPHIA ANTIPOLIS / FR | [2021/35] | Representative(s) | Atout PI Laplace Immeuble Up On 25 Boulevard Romain Rolland CS 40072 75685 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | [2024/30] |
Former [2021/35] | Marks & Clerk France Immeuble "Visium" 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 19784103.4 | 16.10.2019 | [2021/35] | WO2019EP78083 | Priority number, date | FR20180001114 | 22.10.2018 Original published format: FR 1801114 | [2021/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020083724 | Date: | 30.04.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3870998 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3870998 | Date: | 24.07.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/52, G10K11/00, B06B1/06 | [2021/35] | CPC: |
G01S7/52004 (EP,KR,US);
G10K11/008 (EP,KR);
G01S7/534 (US);
B06B1/0633 (EP,KR,US);
B06B2201/74 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AKUSTISCHE SENDEANTENNE | [2021/35] | English: | ACOUSTIC TRANSMITTING ANTENNA | [2021/35] | French: | ANTENNE D'EMISSION ACOUSTIQUE | [2021/35] | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/35] | 16.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2002043897 (DUNN SHENG-DONG [TW], et al); | [A]US2002159336 (BROWN DAVID A [US], et al); | [A]EP2388079 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [AD]US2016193629 (HARDIE DAVID [GB]); | by applicant | FR2776161 | US8717849 | WO2015019116 | US9001623 | FR3026569 |