EP3793029 - DUAL POLARIZED ANTENNA AND ANTENNA ARRAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.07.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KMW Inc. 183-6 Yeongcheon-ro Dongtan-myeon Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 18462 / KR | [2021/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEO, Yong Won 102-611, 74, Seongdong-ro, Dong-Gu Daejeon 34513 / KR | 02 /
KIM, In Ho 302-703, 10, Geumhwa-ro 11beon-gil, Giheung-Gu Yongin-Si, Gyeonggi-do 17073 / KR | 03 /
YANG, Hyuong-Seok 102-1404, 10, Yeongtong-ro 61beon-gil Hwaseong-Si, Gyeonggi-do 18377 / KR | 04 /
CHOI, Oh Seog 880-604, 68, Dongtansupsok-ro Hwaseong-Si, Gyeonggi-do 18340 / KR | [2021/11] | Representative(s) | Scheele Jaeger Wetzel Patentanwälte Goethestraße 21 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/11] | Scheele Wetzel Patentanwälte Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19800816.1 | 10.05.2019 | [2021/11] | WO2019KR05678 | Priority number, date | KR20180053659 | 10.05.2018 Original published format: KR 20180053659 | [2021/11] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019216721 | Date: | 14.11.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3793029 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q9/04, H01Q1/24, H01Q1/52, H01Q21/06 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
H01Q9/0457 (EP);
H01Q21/24 (KR,US);
H01Q1/526 (US);
H01Q1/246 (EP,US);
H01Q1/523 (EP);
H01Q21/065 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/11] | H01Q21/24, H01Q9/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/11] | Title | German: | DUAL POLARISIERTE ANTENNE UND GRUPPENANTENNE | [2021/11] | English: | DUAL POLARIZED ANTENNA AND ANTENNA ARRAY | [2021/11] | French: | ANTENNE À DOUBLE POLARISATION ET RÉSEAU D'ANTENNES | [2021/11] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2020 | Translation filed | 10.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 10.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/11] | 11.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009224995 (PUENTE CARLES [ES], et al); | [Y]DE102008048289 (KATHREIN WERKE KG [DE]); | [XYI]WO2018010817 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN], et al) | International search | [A]KR100854470B (MTI CO LTD [KR], et al); | [A]JP2010220047 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]US2012235876 (HARPER RICHARD JOHN [GB], et al); | [Y]KR20140098760 (ACE TECH CORP [KR]); | [Y]KR20150089509 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR]) |