27.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] |
19.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] |
31.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] |
17.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
27.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
15.09.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.10.2023 [2023/42] |
11.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2023 [2023/37] |
28.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] |
21.07.2023 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 23.08.2023 [2023/34] |
14.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
30.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.08.2023 [2023/31] |
23.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
16.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] |
02.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] |
26.05.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.06.2023 [2023/26] |
05.05.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] |
28.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] |
14.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.05.2023 [2023/20] |
10.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.03.2023 [2023/11] |
03.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] |
27.01.2023 |
Change - representative |
|
27.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] |
20.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.02.2023 [2023/08] |
12.08.2022 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 14.09.2022 [2022/37] |
05.08.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
05.08.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
02.08.2022 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
12.05.2022 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
08.04.2022 |
Change - English title |
published on 11.05.2022 [2022/19] |
08.04.2022 |
Change - French title |
published on 11.05.2022 [2022/19] |
18.02.2022 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 23.03.2022 [2022/12] |
18.02.2022 |
Change - extension states |
published on 23.03.2022 [2022/12] |
23.10.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.06.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.07.2021 [2021/28] |
11.06.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
11.06.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 14.07.2021 [2021/28] |
07.04.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.04.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.03.2021 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
20.06.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.06.2020 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
22.11.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|